Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
381 |
m/e |
10/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7381 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8557 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68557 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/10/1959 |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1930 |
Condensers removed |
02/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 381 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7381 |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8557 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68557 |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
17/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
20/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68557 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|