Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 776 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14819 Week
» 79773 Month
» 282437 Year
» 3309290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
382 |
m/e |
11/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7382 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8558 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68558 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/01/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38D |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
3w/e |
02/07/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1926 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
09/1926 |
Condensers removed |
09/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 382 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7382 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8558 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68558 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
13/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68558 |
|
|