Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19840 Week
» 72856 Month
» 192383 Year
» 3219236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
384 |
m/e |
11/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7384 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8560 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68560 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/01/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1895 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/01/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1929 |
Condensers removed |
12/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/05/1958 |
Spalding MPD |
Spalding, ex M. & G.N. shed is no longer supplied by New England but by Boston. On 11th May the following were on shed-D2234, 43059/ 61/2/4/5/80/3/5, 61756, 64171/2/91, 64231 /78 an 68560 all of Boston (40F). |
SLS/195806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 384 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7384 |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8560 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68560 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68560 |
|
|