Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 342 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18145 Week
» 71161 Month
» 190688 Year
» 3217541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
386 |
m/e |
12/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7386 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8562 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68562 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 15/08/1956 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
68B |
Dumfries |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
64E |
Polmont |
4w/e |
19/03/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/08/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1927 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1927 |
Condensers removed |
11/1927 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/05/1947 |
St Margarets MPD |
An unusual collection of locos. was observed at the old round-house on 10/5, comprising five ex N.B.R. 'Y9,' Nos. 8093, 8097, 8099, 8101, 8122 (all of which were remarkably clean), two ex G.E.R. 'J.69' Nos. 8562 and 8568, and one ex G.E.R. 'F7,' No. 7093. The latter having since been seen at Eastfield on 1/6, awaiting shop repairs. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 Nos. 77078, 77206, 77419 and 77494 were also on shed. |
SLS/194708 |
06/10/1951 |
South West Scotland |
An unusual visitor at Dumfries on 3rd September, was 60160 Auld Reekie, which left light for Carlisle about 2 p.m. Another interesting engine was ex-GE 0-6-0T, 8562 on loan to Dumfries. Services on the Lockerbie Branch are now only two each way daily (4 on Saturdays) and there is a distinct possibility that passenger services will cease altogether in the near future. Coaling at Beattock is still done by hand, and this is a laborious business. Bunkers are not allowed to get too low if this can be avoided, and after about every second trip up the bank, engines return to the shed for coal. Banking is in the hands of McIntosh 0-4-4Ts and Pickersgill 4-6-2Ts, the latter being less favoured by the men. |
SLS/195112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 386 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7386 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8562 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (68B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (68B) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68562 |
|
|
16/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (64E) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68562 |
|
|