Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 836 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18639 Week
» 71655 Month
» 191182 Year
» 3218035 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
387 |
m/e |
12/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7387 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8563 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68563 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/10/1960 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
13/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
01/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1930 |
Condensers removed |
01/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 387 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7387 |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8563 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68563 |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68563 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|