Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
389 |
m/e |
12/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7389 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8565 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68565 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/08/1962 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1930 |
Condensers removed |
03/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 389 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7389 |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8565 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68565 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68565 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|