Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4296 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17702 Week
» 70718 Month
» 190245 Year
» 3217098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
260 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7260 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8586 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68586 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 21/05/1956 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 260 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7260 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8586 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68586 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68586 |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|