Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14450 Week
» 67466 Month
» 186993 Year
» 3213846 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
261 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7261 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8587 |
on |
22/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68587 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/10/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1899 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
5w/e |
20/04/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 261 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7261 |
|
|
22/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8587 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68587 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68587 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|