|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/08/1946 | Liverpool Street Station | The loco. hauling the Scandinavian now carries a headboard on the smokebox-first time noted was 8780 on 13/8. The 'Hook' has in its formation two of the new L.N.E.R vestibule coaches with middle doors, easily picked out by their brown roofs. On 16/9 'J.67' 8591 was in charge of a very lengthy train of wagons proceeding along the marshes from Temple Mills, with more than 55 vehicles! | SLS/194701 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1899 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 203 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7203 | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8591 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68591 | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
10/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
04/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68591 | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |