Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2863 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16269 Week
» 69285 Month
» 188812 Year
» 3215665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
189 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
Great Eastern Railway (2nd) |
305 |
m/e |
01/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7305 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8596 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68596 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S48 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/11/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
01/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1930 |
Condensers removed |
01/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 189 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1909 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 305 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7305 |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8596 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68596 |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68596 |
|
|