Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2009 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19812 Week
» 72828 Month
» 192355 Year
» 3219208 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
193 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7193 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8600 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68600 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S48 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SL |
South Lynn |
w/e |
16/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1936 |
Condensers removed |
02/1942 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 193 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7193 |
|
|
07/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
02/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8600 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68600 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68600 |
|
|