Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1048 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14454 Week
» 67470 Month
» 186997 Year
» 3213850 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
194 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7194 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8601 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68601 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S48 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/10/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
w/e |
18/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1926 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1926 |
Condensers removed |
08/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 194 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7194 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8601 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68601 |
|
|
18/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
01/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68601 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|