Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
196 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7196 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8603 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68603 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S48 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/03/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1900 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
22/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/03/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1930 |
Condensers removed |
03/1942 |
Condenser fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 196 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7196 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8603 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68603 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68603 |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|