Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 836 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18639 Week
» 71655 Month
» 191182 Year
» 3218035 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
160 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7160 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8607 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68607 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R50 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/05/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1901 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/05/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1933 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1940 |
Condenser fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/08/1946 |
Liverpool Street Station |
On. 22/8 'N.7' 9646 became derailed at the end of Platforms 3/4 in the evening rush hour, and the breakdown train was in charge of 7160. |
SLS/194701 |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 160 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7160 |
|
|
06/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8607 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68607 |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
05/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68607 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|