Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
163 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7163 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8610 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68610 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R50 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/01/1957 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1901 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34D |
|
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
22/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1926 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1926 |
Condensers removed |
11/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 163 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7163 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8610 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68610 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
07/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68610 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|