Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
165 |
m/e |
07/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7165 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8612 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68612 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R50 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/06/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1901 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/06/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1931 |
Condensers removed |
07/1940 |
Condenser fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford Works (foundry) |
Steam locomotives-Old Works: 68633; waiting cut-up 67726, 68924; foundry 68612, 69690 |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 165 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7165 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
07/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8612 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68612 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
26/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68612 |
|
|