|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 42 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7042 | ||
03/1924 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
03/1937 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8638 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
16/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68638 | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
21/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
24/02/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68638 | ||
04/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |