Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2047 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15453 Week
» 68469 Month
» 187996 Year
» 3214849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
44 |
m/e |
07/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7044 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8640 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68640 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C72 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 22/04/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1912 |
LOW |
|
Lowestoft |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
32A |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/04/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 44 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7044 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8640 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68640 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68640 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|