Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1062 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14468 Week
» 67484 Month
» 187011 Year
» 3213864 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
47 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7047 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8643 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68643 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C72 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/11/1959 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
25/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1919 |
Condensers removed |
03/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 47 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7047 |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8643 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68643 |
|
|
16/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68643 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|