Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2261 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20064 Week
» 73080 Month
» 192607 Year
» 3219460 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
49 |
m/e |
09/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7049 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8645 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68645 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C72 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/11/1959 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 49 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7049 |
|
|
05/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8645 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68645 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68645 |
|
|