Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 49 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 7049 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 8645 m/e 12/1946
BR 68645 m/e 07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J68
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J6809/1912
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number C72
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/08/1953
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 13/09/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 22/11/1958
   Withdrawn 06/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   06/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GER Number 49
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7049    
05/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8645    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68645    
22/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68645    

prev prev