Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 578 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 578 Week
» 20223 Month
» 54865 Year
» 1276430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 22 m/e 12/1913
LNER (1924) 7022 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 8648 m/e 09/1946
BR 68648 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J68
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J6812/1913
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G75
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1913
Withdrawal Mon 24/08/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33A Plaistow 5w/e 21/06/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn 24/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   24/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1937 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as GER Number 22
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7022    
01/1937 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8648    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68648    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68648    

prev prev