Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 591 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 591 Week
» 30089 Month
» 366935 Year
» 1588500 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 23 m/e 12/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7023 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8649 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68649 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J68
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J6812/1913
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G75
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1913
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Scrapping During 10/1961
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1913
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 17/02/1951
30A Stratford 5w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 23
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7023    
02/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8649    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68649    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68649    

prev prev