Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
24 |
m/e |
12/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7024 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8650 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68650 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G75 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 11/10/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 24 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7024 |
|
|
05/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8650 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68650 |
|
|
11/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68650 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|