|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 38E Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7038 | ||
05/1935 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8664 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) | ||
04/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68664 | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
12/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
02/09/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68664 | ||
10/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |