Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1210 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24841 Week
» 89795 Month
» 292459 Year
» 3319312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
55 |
m/e |
05/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7055 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8621 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
68621 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J69 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S56 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1933 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
04/1933 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1937 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 55 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7055 |
|
|
04/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
08/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8621 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68621 |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68621 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|