Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1323 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14729 Week
» 67745 Month
» 187272 Year
» 3214125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
139 |
m/e |
10/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7139 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8219 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68219 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J70 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 31/08/1953 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/08/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 139 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7139 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8219 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68219 |
|
|
1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
31/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68219 |
|
|