|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/09/1947 | Stratford Works | The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. | SLS/194711 |
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 126 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7126 | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8225 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) | ||
11/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) | ||
05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68225 | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
09/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
23/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
08/03/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68225 |