Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 902 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18705 Week
» 71721 Month
» 191248 Year
» 3218101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2192 |
m/e |
11/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8709 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68709 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 11/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 26/02/1962 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
08/04/1961 |
ALLOC |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
4w/e |
06/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1914 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2192 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8709 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68709 |
|
|
15/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
26/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68709 |
|
|