Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 337 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2902 Week
» 1640 Month
» 415961 Year
» 1637526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2311 m/e 12/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8718 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68718 on 22/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class J72
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Mon 30/06/1958
Service Life 37 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1920
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 20/09/1952
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 22/05/1954
   Withdrawn on 30/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 22/05/1954
WDN   on 30/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2311
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8718    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
22/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68718    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
30/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68718    

prev prev