Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 174 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 174 Week
» 39220 Month
» 413233 Year
» 1634798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2323 m/e 05/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8730 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68730 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class J72
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 401
To Service During 05/1922
Withdrawal Mon 07/11/1960
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1922
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52A Gateshead w/e 20/06/1959
52H Tyne Dock w/e 22/08/1959
   Withdrawn on 07/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOR Borough Gardens w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC 52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 07/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2323
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 401
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8730    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68730    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
22/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
07/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68730    

prev prev