Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 74 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4034 Week
» 33620 Month
» 407633 Year
» 1629198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 69002 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class J72
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2083
To Service During 11/1949
Withdrawal Mon 01/10/1962
Service Life 12 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1949
54A Sunderland 4w/e 20/09/1952
51F West Auckland w/e 17/09/1960
51A Darlington w/e 07/01/1961
51L Thornaby w/e 07/10/1961
51A Darlington w/e 03/03/1962
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW HLA   on 02/11/1949
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 51A Darlington 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 6w/e 11/11/1961
ALLOC 51A Darlington 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   on 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
14/07/1962 Darlington MPD (Stored) Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 69002
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2083
   
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69002    

prev prev