|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/08/1961 | York South | York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. | SLS/196110 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 69003 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2084 |
||
27/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69003 |