Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 90 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4050 Week
» 33636 Month
» 407649 Year
» 1629214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 69018 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class J72
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 01/1951 to Sunderland (SUN)
Withdrawal Mon 08/10/1962
Service Life 11 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SUN Sunderland (New) m/e 01/1951
51F West Auckland 4w/e 20/09/1952
51A Darlington w/e 07/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 51A Darlington 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 69018
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Sunderland (SUN)
   
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69018    

prev prev