Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 285 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14328 Week
» 79282 Month
» 281946 Year
» 3308799 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69025 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2153 |
To Service |
During 04/1951 to Blaydon (52C) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
52C |
Blaydon |
on |
26/04/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
6w/e |
11/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
3w/e |
31/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1951 |
North Eastern Sightings |
Seen on a recent tour in the area: New class J 72. 69020 at York; 69021/2/5 in Darlington Shed (Darlington Nos. 2149/50/3 of 1951); 69024 in Blaydon Shed (Darlington No. 2151/51). |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69025 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2153 Allocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69025 |
|
|