|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
20/07/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1900 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 798 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5736 |
||
10/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9798 | ||
04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8445 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) | ||
12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68445 | ||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68445 |