|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
08/02/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1901 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 806 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5744 |
||
12/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9806 | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8453 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68453 | ||
29/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68453 |