Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 915 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18718 Week
» 71734 Month
» 191261 Year
» 3218114 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
825 |
m/e |
04/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9825 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8472 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68472 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J83 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4733 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 12/02/1962 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1901 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1944 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1944 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/03/1961 |
Polmont MPD (in store) |
On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. |
SLS/196104 |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
02/08/1962 |
Polmont MPD |
In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 825 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4733 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9825 |
|
|
08/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8472 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68472 |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68472 |
|
|