Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2282 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20085 Week
» 73101 Month
» 192628 Year
» 3219481 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
840 |
m/e |
01/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9840 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8324 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68324 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/07/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1905 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/07/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/07/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1905 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 840 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9840 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8324 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68324 |
|
|
03/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68324 |
|
|