Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1426 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19229 Week
» 72245 Month
» 191772 Year
» 3218625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
842 |
m/e |
09/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9842 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8326 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68326 |
on |
10/03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 16/10/1959 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1905 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65F |
|
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1905 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 842 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9842 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8326 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
10/03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68326 |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
16/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68326 |
|
|