Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 518 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18321 Week
» 71337 Month
» 190864 Year
» 3217717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
234 |
m/e |
03/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9234 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8333 |
on |
13/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68333 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 21/03/1958 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1909 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65D |
|
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
65D |
|
Dawsholm |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/03/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 234 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9234 |
|
|
13/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8333 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68333 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
21/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68333 |
|
|