Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 49 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 18960 Week
» 83914 Month
» 286578 Year
» 3313431 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
236 |
m/e |
03/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9236 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8335 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68335 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 08/10/1962 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64B |
Haymarket |
4w/e |
19/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
5w/e |
12/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/05/1962 |
Bathgate MPD |
Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 236 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9236 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8335 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68335 |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
08/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68335 |
|
|