Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1703 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19506 Week
» 72522 Month
» 192049 Year
» 3218902 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
237 |
m/e |
04/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9237 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8336 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68336 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 28/05/1962 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
22/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
'J.88' No. 68336 EFD was ex Works W/E 12/3 without let-tering, the number being on the lower half of the tanks, while No. 69124 EFD also without lettering, had the number on the middle of the tanks. No. 90004 THJ was ex Works on 4/4, lettered 'British Railways'; 'Class 0.7' and the shed were painted on the buffer beam. No. 62405 The Fair Maid was ex Works W/E 26/3, painted black and fully lined, this being the first 'D.29' to be dealt with in this style. |
SLS/194905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 237 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9237 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8336 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68336 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
15/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68336 |
|
|