Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 831 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18634 Week
» 71650 Month
» 191177 Year
» 3218030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
114 |
m/e |
04/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9114 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8339 |
on |
13/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68339 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 21/10/1958 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1912 |
HAY |
|
Haymarket |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/10/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1912 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 114 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9114 |
|
|
13/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8339 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68339 |
|
|
21/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68339 |
|
|