Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 811 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14217 Week
» 67233 Month
» 186760 Year
» 3213613 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
118 |
m/e |
05/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9118 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8342 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68342 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 12/02/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1912 |
STG |
|
Stirling |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STM |
St Margarets |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/05/1962 |
Bathgate MPD |
Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1912 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 118 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9118 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8342 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68342 |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68342 |
|
|