Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 787 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18590 Week
» 71606 Month
» 191133 Year
» 3217986 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
271 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9271 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8351 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68353 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1919 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 12/02/1962 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
HIRE |
|
N.C.B. Carnock Coke Ovens, Bannockburn |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
EXHIRE |
63B |
Stirling |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 271 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9271 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8351 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68353 |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68353 |
|
|