Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1140 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18943 Week
» 71959 Month
» 191486 Year
» 3218339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
279 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9279 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8352 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68354 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1919 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1960 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 7 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1919 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65E |
|
Kipps |
4w/e |
26/10/1957 |
64E |
|
Polmont |
4w/e |
18/01/1958 |
65E |
|
Kipps |
4w/e |
13/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
64E |
Polmont |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
64E |
Polmont |
4w/e |
13/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 279 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9279 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8352 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68354 |
|
|
26/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
18/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (64E) |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68354 |
|
|