Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75108 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8009 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68009 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. |
Works Number |
3158 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/08/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1944 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
11/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1948 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1962 |
LNER Classes extinct |
This months withdrawals result in the following classes becoming extinct (except for any locos. preserved) : -J15, J17, J19, J20, J69, N2, N7, this additionally means that there are now no longer any ex-G.E. locos left on capital stock. Following the above transfers and withdrawals there are now no steam locos operating at all in the G.E. area of British Railways apart from those left at March for working out of the area. In view of this it seems probable that the transfer of 68009/18 to Stratford recently reported was not correct and that these two locos should have been shown as withdrawn; however, confirmation and dates are still awaited from Eastern Region before an official correction can be made. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75108 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd., Works Number 3158 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8009 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68009 |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68009 |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|