Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 676 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14082 Week
» 67098 Month
» 186625 Year
» 3213478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75124 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8012 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68012 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. |
Works Number |
3174 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1947 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/09/1967 |
L.M.S.R. 3F 0-6-0Ts. |
On 16th September, 47383 was on Westhouses shed and 47629 an 47289 were at Williamthorpe Colliery. The other spare engine for the Colliery working kept at Westhouses was J94 68012, whilst withdrawn 47313 was still at Westhouses. |
SLS/196710 |
04/10/1967 |
Last Standard Guage tanks withdrawn |
The last of the standard gauge tanks in Great Britain were taken out of traffic from 4th October viz. J94 68012 and LMS 0-6-0Ts 47289, 47383 an 47629. Just prior to that date, 47629 and 68012 had been working at Williamthorpe Colliery Derbyshire with the other two spare at Westhouses shed; now all four stand together at Westhouses shed. NCB diesel (English Electric D1196 of 1967) 0-6-0 has taken over work at the Colliery. Now only the 5' 3' gauge tanks remain in N. Ireland and the narrow gauge tanks of the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth. |
SLS/196711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75124 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd., Works Number 3174 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8012 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68012 |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68012 |
|
|