Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 100 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4060 Week
» 33646 Month
» 407659 Year
» 1629224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 75149 m/e 12/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8017 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 68017 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Works Number 3199
To Service During 12/1944
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962
Service Life 17 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1944
SCA Scarborough on 01/01/1948
54D Consett 4w/e 20/01/1951
54A Sunderland 4w/e 17/02/1951
51A Darlington w/e 20/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 54D Consett m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 75149
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd., Works Number 3199
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8017    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Scarborough (SCA)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68017    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (54D)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68017    

prev prev